08/29/2011 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 13. Noes 17. Page 2084.). | |||
06/28/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 22). | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/28/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 7. Page 1128.) | |||
04/25/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
04/05/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/04/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Read first time. To print. |