02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/26/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/11/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/30/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Read first time. To print. |