|
06/28/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1731.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|