LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB489
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB489
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB489
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
05/27/2011
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
04/06/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
03/22/2011
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
03/03/2011
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
02/16/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
02/15/2011
Read first time. To print.