California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB492 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill July 6, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012
Bill June 27, 2011
Bill June 20, 2011