California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012
Bill May 17, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011