02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 13). | |||
03/30/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Read first time. To print. |