|
08/30/2012
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 29). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Measure version as amended on June 22 corrected.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 1752.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|