|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 674, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2360.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1666.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|