LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB504
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB504
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB504
Compare Versions
AB504 Chaptered September 7, 2011
AB504 Enrolled August 24, 2011
AB504 Amended July 6, 2011
AB504 Amended June 21, 2011
AB504 Amended May 10, 2011
AB504 Amended April 14, 2011
AB504 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB504 Chaptered September 7, 2011
AB504 Enrolled August 24, 2011
AB504 Amended July 6, 2011
AB504 Amended June 21, 2011
AB504 Amended May 10, 2011
AB504 Amended April 14, 2011
AB504 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare