07/06/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/23/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
05/31/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 1666.) | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Read first time. To print. |