LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB509
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB509
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB509
Compare Versions
AB509 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB509 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB509 Amended August 30, 2011
AB509 Amended August 15, 2011
AB509 Amended June 21, 2011
AB509 Amended May 27, 2011
AB509 Amended March 25, 2011
AB509 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB509 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB509 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB509 Amended August 30, 2011
AB509 Amended August 15, 2011
AB509 Amended June 21, 2011
AB509 Amended May 27, 2011
AB509 Amended March 25, 2011
AB509 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare