|
07/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1824.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|