LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB510
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB510
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB510
Compare Versions
AB510 Chaptered July 13, 2012
AB510 Enrolled July 5, 2012
AB510 Amended July 2, 2012
AB510 Amended June 15, 2012
AB510 Amended April 16, 2012
AB510 Amended March 29, 2012
AB510 Amended January 13, 2012
AB510 Amended January 4, 2012
AB510 Amended March 31, 2011
AB510 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB510 Chaptered July 13, 2012
AB510 Enrolled July 5, 2012
AB510 Amended July 2, 2012
AB510 Amended June 15, 2012
AB510 Amended April 16, 2012
AB510 Amended March 29, 2012
AB510 Amended January 13, 2012
AB510 Amended January 4, 2012
AB510 Amended March 31, 2011
AB510 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare