LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB514
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB514
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB514
Compare Versions
AB514 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB514 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB514 Amended August 23, 2011
AB514 Amended April 27, 2011
AB514 Amended March 31, 2011
AB514 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB514 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB514 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB514 Amended August 23, 2011
AB514 Amended April 27, 2011
AB514 Amended March 31, 2011
AB514 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare