|
07/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 1805.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 19. Page 1821.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 33. Noes 22. Page 1675.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Brownley.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 47. Noes 18. Page 1581.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|