|
05/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 12, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 4763.).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 3425.).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Negrete McLeod.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1177.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|