06/06/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/26/2011 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1356.) | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/30/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/24/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |||
03/23/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Read first time. To print. |