|
09/01/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 1782.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 1789.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 1691.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 7.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 7.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|