|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 2358.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 1818.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|