California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 9, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012