|
08/30/2011
|
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 3. Page 1589.)
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1502.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|