LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB529
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB529
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB529
Compare Versions
AB529 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB529 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB529 Amended August 18, 2011
AB529 Amended July 11, 2011
AB529 Amended June 16, 2011
AB529 Amended May 3, 2011
AB529 Amended March 24, 2011
AB529 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB529 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB529 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB529 Amended August 18, 2011
AB529 Amended July 11, 2011
AB529 Amended June 16, 2011
AB529 Amended May 3, 2011
AB529 Amended March 24, 2011
AB529 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare