California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011