California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2011

Amended

Bill June 14, 2011
Bill April 11, 2011
Bill March 7, 2011