|
07/03/2012
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 1281.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|