02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/25/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/15/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Read first time. To print. |