|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 3. Page 1694.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|