LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB547
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB547
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB547
Compare Versions
AB547 Chaptered September 6, 2011
AB547 Enrolled August 19, 2011
AB547 Amended June 21, 2011
AB547 Amended June 7, 2011
AB547 Amended May 5, 2011
AB547 Amended April 25, 2011
AB547 Amended April 7, 2011
AB547 Amended March 31, 2011
AB547 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB547 Chaptered September 6, 2011
AB547 Enrolled August 19, 2011
AB547 Amended June 21, 2011
AB547 Amended June 7, 2011
AB547 Amended May 5, 2011
AB547 Amended April 25, 2011
AB547 Amended April 7, 2011
AB547 Amended March 31, 2011
AB547 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare