|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 499, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2169.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1461.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|