LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB556
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB556
Action History
05/26/2011
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
03/22/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
03/03/2011
Referred to Com. on JUD.
02/17/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
02/16/2011
Read first time. To print.