09/26/2011 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
09/07/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/01/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2207.). | |||
06/15/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 14). | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/26/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/26/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 1549.) | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 12). | |||
04/05/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/04/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/22/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Read first time. To print. |