California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill July 12, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011