California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB561 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 15, 2011

Chaptered

Bill August 4, 2011

Amended

Bill June 28, 2011
Bill June 7, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011