08/31/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 5050.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5072.). | |||
08/29/2012 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 0. Page 4946.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
07/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
07/01/2011 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/29/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/28/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/23/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1500.) | |||
05/16/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Read first time. To print. |