California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB564 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill June 30, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011