California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB566 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill June 21, 2011
Bill March 22, 2011