|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2555.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2013.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1357.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|