02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/03/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/26/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Read first time. To print. |