LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB589
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB589
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB589
Compare Versions
AB589 Chaptered September 17, 2012
AB589 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB589 Amended August 21, 2012
AB589 Amended August 17, 2011
AB589 Amended July 12, 2011
AB589 Amended May 27, 2011
AB589 Amended April 11, 2011
AB589 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB589 Chaptered September 17, 2012
AB589 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB589 Amended August 21, 2012
AB589 Amended August 17, 2011
AB589 Amended July 12, 2011
AB589 Amended May 27, 2011
AB589 Amended April 11, 2011
AB589 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare