02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/13/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/31/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/08/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. | |||
12/07/2010 | Introduced. To print. |