California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 27, 2011