|
08/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1782.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 981.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/08/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|