|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1688.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) . Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1354.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|