California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 15, 2011

Chaptered

Bill August 3, 2011

Amended

Bill July 1, 2011
Bill June 7, 2011
Bill June 2, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill April 13, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011