|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1975.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1450.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/08/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|