|
09/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments and whereby the bill was ordered to enrollment. Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 2855.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2170.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 877.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|