|
10/03/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 2892.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2165.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 1651.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|