|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 44. Page 3629.).
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 40. Noes 28. Page 3590.)
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ammiano.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 7.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|