02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Read first time. To print. |